U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DORSEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.