U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BURKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.