U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOWE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 18, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.