U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JAMISON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.