U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 02, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.