U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FOSTER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.