U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUKES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.