U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PATTERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.