U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PATEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.