U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MONTERIO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.