U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOWARD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jencks Act Materials]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.