U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.