U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00015-8
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WESLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • August 15, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for List of Government Witnesses]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Information on Prior Convictions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jencks Act Materials]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.