U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 18, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.