U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00024-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MARSHALL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.