U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HERNANDEZ-OLEA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.