U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BURGESS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 13, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.