U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SACHY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Inspect]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Inspect]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 03, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.