U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MELENDEZ-SANTOS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.