U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00025-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AVERY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.