U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 07, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.