U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BODIFORD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.