U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BUTLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.