U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STITT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 01, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.