U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOODY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 07, 2018: [Protective Order]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.