U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ESPINOSA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2018: [Interpreter Appointed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.