U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00046-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BENTLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 05, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 13, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.