U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLSTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.