U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITLOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.