U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.