U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.