U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FERGUSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.