U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MYERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 19, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.