U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. OFTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.