U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00095-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILLS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.