U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JENSEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.