U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAWSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pretrial]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.