U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DIXON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 29, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.