U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WAMPLER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Revoking Voluntary Surrender]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.