U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Joint Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.