U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v.MORRIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.