U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRADFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.