U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JERNIGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.