U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUDSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.