U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.