U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KEGLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 11, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.