U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DREW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.