U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.