U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.