U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHAMSID-DEEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.